- Home
- Financial Advisers Australia (FAA)
- Jacqueline Irwin
Jacqueline Irwin
- Name
- Jacqueline Irwin
- ID
- 285008
- ABN
- –
- First Provided Advice
- 2011
Qualifications
Details on the qualifications or training courses the adviser has completed that are relevant to providing financial services
Memberships
Details of memberships of professional bodies or industry associations relevant to providing financial services
Licencee
- Status
- Ceased
- Licence Holder
- Count Financial Limited (#227232)
- Commenced
- March 7, 2022
- Ceased
- Jan. 31, 2024
- Status
- Ceased
- Licence Holder
- Financial Services Partners Pty Limited (#237590)
- Commenced
- Oct. 15, 2019
- Ceased
- April 7, 2021
- Status
- Ceased
- Licence Holder
- RI Advice Group Pty Ltd (#238429)
- Commenced
- April 8, 2021
- Ceased
- June 25, 2021
- Status
- Ceased
- Licence Holder
- Wealth Market Pty Ltd (#482898)
- Commenced
- July 5, 2021
- Ceased
- March 6, 2022
- Status
- Ceased
- Licence Holder
- Consultum Financial Advisers Pty Ltd (#230323)
- Commenced
- May 6, 2019
- Ceased
- Sept. 6, 2019
- Status
- Ceased
- Licence Holder
- Dover Financial Advisers Pty Ltd (#307248)
- Commenced
- March 19, 2015
- Ceased
- June 30, 2016
- Status
- Ceased
- Licence Holder
- Fiducian Financial Services Pty Ltd (#231103)
- Commenced
- July 21, 2016
- Ceased
- April 30, 2019
- Status
- Ceased
- Licence Holder
- Quantum Financial Services Australia Pty. Limited (#239200)
- Commenced
- Jan. 21, 2005
- Ceased
- July 14, 2011